HI SB588 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB588

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires a hotel employer to recall the same number of employees in substantially the same classification as the employer's active workforce as of 3/1/2020. Requires certain laid-off employees to be offered job positions as they become available, under certain terms and conditions. Prohibits an employer from retaliatory actions against employees who exercise their right to recall. Establishes the rights of employers and employees under the right of recall law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Employment.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to EET/LCA, JDC.
2021-01-25SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB642 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB588 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to EET/LCA, JDC.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback