HI SB586 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 203, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-02 - Act 203, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides, under certain circumstances, an exemption from building code requirements and an expansion of existing building permit exemptions for nonresidential buildings or structures, including indigenous Hawaiian hale, on commercial farms and ranches located outside the urban district. (CD1)
Title
Agricultural Buildings; Permits; Building Code; Exemptions; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-02 | Senate | Act 203, 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2013-07-02 | House | Act 203, on 6/26/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1306). |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 761). |
2013-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 755). |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Senator(s) L. Thielen. 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Morikawa voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice, Tuesday 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 45) as amended in (CD 1). |
2013-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-13. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 45). |
2013-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Evans, McKelvey, Onishi, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Espero, Kouchi; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 3:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-13 11:00AM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-13 3:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 699). |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Wooley, Evans, McKelvey Co-Chairs; Onishi, Cheape. |
2013-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 692). |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees appointed: Nishihara, Chair; Espero, Co-Chair(s); Kouchi, L. Thielen, Slom. |
2013-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 607). |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 536). |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Cullen, Tsuji voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ito voting no (1) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-13. |
2013-04-05 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1555) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Evans, C. Lee, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Har, Tsuji, Yamane, Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cabanilla, Cachola, Carroll, Ito. |
2013-04-03 | House | Bill scheduled for Reconsideration of prior decision by CPC on Wednesday, 04-03-13 2:15PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-01 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-03-27 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-01-13 2:25PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-13. |
2013-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-27-13 4:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and McKelvey, Takumi, Woodson excused (3). |
2013-03-22 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Hanohano, Kawakami, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cullen, C. Lee. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Brower, Cachola, Ohno, Takayama, Tsuji, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Choy, Tokioka, Cheape. |
2013-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-14-13 11:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-13. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 03-11-13 8:40AM in House conference room 312. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to AGR/WAL, CPC, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 172) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from AGL/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 506) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AGL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Kouchi, Dela Cruz, English; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Wakai, Slom. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM deferred the measure until 02-12-13 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL deferred the measure until 02-12-13 2:51PM in conference room 229. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-13 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to AGL/PSM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB489 (Same As) 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on AGL/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224.