HI HB489 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on AGL/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - The committee(s) on AGL/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides, under certain circumstances, an exemption from building code and permit requirements for nonresidential buildings or structures on farms. Effective July 1, 2013. (HB489 HD1)
Title
Agricultural Building Permits; Exemptions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/PSM deleted the measure from the public hearing scheduled on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-13 2:30PM in conference room 224. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to AGL/PSM. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 145). |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Coffman, Hanohano, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2013-02-28 | House | Deferred one day Friday, 03-01-13. |
2013-02-20 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2013-02-20 | House | Reported from AGR/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 632) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Hanohano, Kawakami, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. |
2013-02-04 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Wooley, Onishi, Choy, Ohno, Takayama, Tokioka, Tsuji, Cheape, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, Cachola. |
2013-01-31 | House | Re-referred to AGR/WAL, referral sheet 10 |
2013-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR/WAL on Monday, 02-04-13 8:30AM in House conference room Auditorium. |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to AGR, WAL, referral sheet 3 |
2013-01-22 | House | Introduced and Passed First Reading |
2013-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |