HI SB566 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB566
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the offense of unauthorized attachment of an object to a fence, gate, or wall, which is committed when a person knowingly attaches an object to a fence, gate, wall, or other structure or barrier without the owner's permission. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Penal Code.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of all House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 363). |
2020-06-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Recommitted to Conference committee as amended in CD 1 with none voting no and none excused. |
2019-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 11) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 11). |
2019-04-18 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) San Buenaventura. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kim. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-18-19 3:30PM in conference room 325. |
2019-04-16 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903). |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Rhoads Chair; Kim, Wakai, Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee Chair; Morikawa, San Buenaventura, Thielen. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 583). |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-03 | House | Deferred one day 04-04-19. |
2019-04-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4). |
2019-04-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1918) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Say, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Takayama; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 189) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 781) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-20-19 10:00AM in conference room 016. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB566 (Carry Over) 2019-05-01 - Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).