HI SB508 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-11 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a condominium association, as a junior lienholder, to commence or continue a nonjudicial foreclosure action on a property subject to a judicial foreclosure even if the lender has filed for foreclosure. Preserves the right of owner-occupants to require the foreclosing mortgagee to participate in the dispute resolution process in situations where an association forecloses on residential real property occupied by owner-occupant mortgagors and the mortgagee subsequently forecloses its lien on the same property. (SD1)
Title
Foreclosure Actions; Junior Lienholders; Condominium Associations
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 165) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Taniguchi. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB25 (Same As) 2013-06-26 - Act 197, 6/25/2013 (Gov. Msg. No. 1300).