HI SB502 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-11 - Carried over to 2010 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the board of regents to charge fees and enter into lease agreements for the Mauna Kea lands, adopt rules to regulate public and commercial activities on Mauna Kea lands, establish and collect administrative fines for violations; establishes a Mauna Kea lands management special fund for the University of Hawaii to manage Mauna Kea lands; requires annual reports to the legislature. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii; Mauna Kea Management; Special Fund
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Norman Sakamoto [D] | Sen. Dwight Takamine [D] | Sen. Jill Tokuda [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Carried over to 2010 Regular Session. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2009-02-18 | (S) Reported from HRE/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 116) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2009-02-13 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Tokuda, Bunda, Fukunaga, Kokubun; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Takamine, Hemmings. | |
2009-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Sakamoto, Baker, Kokubun, Takamine, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-13-09 3:30pm in conference room 229. | |
2009-02-06 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE deferred the measure until 02-10-09 1:15pm in conference room 225. | |
2009-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HRE-WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-09 4:00 PM in conference room 229. | |
2009-01-28 | (S) Referred to HRE/WTL, WAM. | |
2009-01-26 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2009-01-23 | (S) Introduced. |