HI SB501 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "RME" to include the person who qualifies the contracting entity to direct and supervise employees pursuant to chapter 448E, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Contractors
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Malama Solomon [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee on CPN deferred the measure. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-13 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPN. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=501&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB501_.HTM |