HI SB5 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB5
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the State to consider hurricane resistant criteria when designing and constructing new state buildings, constructed on or after 7/1/2023, for the capability of providing shelter refuge.
Title
Relating To Hurricane Resistant Criteria.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to PSM/GVO, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Re-Referred to PSM/GVO, WAM.
Subjects
Disaster Preparedness
Hurricane
New State Buildings
Public Improvements
Standards
State Building Design and Construction
Hurricane
New State Buildings
Public Improvements
Standards
State Building Design and Construction
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=5&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB5_.HTM |