HI SB481 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HWN/EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Re-Referred to HWN/EDU, WAM.
Pending: Senate Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the instructional office of Hawaiian studies for the purpose of providing instruction to public school students on Hawaiian history, culture, arts, and language. Makes an appropriation for the instructional office of Hawaiian studies.
Title
Department of Education; Hawaiian Education Programs; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HWN/EDU, WAM. |
2013-12-18 | Carried over to 2014 Regular Session. | |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to THA/EDU, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB253 (Same As) 2013-12-18 - Carried over to 2014 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=481&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/SB481_.HTM |