HI SB480 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB480
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Pulehunui community development authority as an autonomous community development authority under the Hawaii community development authority for the purposes of developing the Pulehunui community development district. Authorizes the Hawaii community development authority to obtain various forms of federal funding for construction, maintenance, and development projects in the Pulehunui community development district.
Title
Relating To Development Districts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EET/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 171) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET/WTL, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET/WTL, JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB480 (Carry Over) 2021-02-12 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM/JDC.
HB774 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).
HB774 (Same As) 2021-07-06 - Vetoed (Gov. Msg. No. 1287).