HI SB478 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB478
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a county council member to provide other council members with government records that are public record and created by persons who are not members or employees of the county council, subject to certain conditions. (SB478 HD1)
Title
Relating To Government Records.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 385). |
2018-03-14 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-01-17 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 1). |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Kim, K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott. |
2017-04-07 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 540). |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 464). |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Oshiro, Saiki, Say excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan excused (2). |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1572) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-03-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morikawa. |
2017-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 171) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB325 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB478 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325.
SB478 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325.