HI SB469 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 195, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-12 - Act 195, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning 7/1/2017 and ending 6/30/2019. Effective 7/1/2017. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-12 | House | Act 195, on 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2017-07-12 | Senate | Act 195, 07/11/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1309). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) S. Chang, K. Kahele, Ruderman, L. Thielen. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). |
2017-04-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 108) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 108). |
2017-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Luke, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Tokuda, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:50AM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Tokuda Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Luke Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2017-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 519). |
2017-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Thielen, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ohno, Saiki excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1714), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Quinlan, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-04-17 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1366) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Oshiro, Thielen; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-22-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 31 |
2017-03-14 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 389) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) English). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-13-17. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 915) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-17 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 430) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 9:10AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB320 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2