HI HB320 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB320
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the judiciary for the fiscal biennium beginning July 1, 2017, and ending June 30, 2019. Effective July 1, 2017.
Title
Relating To The Judiciary.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-20 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB320 (Carry Over) 2017-01-23 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=320&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HB320_.HTM |