HI SB468 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB468
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to adopt rules to prevent and respond to the introduction of aquatic nuisance species from discharges incidental to the normal operation of a vessel and reflect the relationship between the federal Vessel Incidental Discharge Act of 2018, as amended, and state law.
Title
Relating To Aquatic Nuisance Species.
Sponsors
Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Brandon Elefante [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee on TCA deferred the measure. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-14-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL/TCA, JDC. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB755 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB468 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
SB468 (Carry Over) 2023-02-14 - The committee on TCA deferred the measure.
Subjects
Aquatic Nuisance Species
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Discharges Incidental to the Normal Operation of a Vessel
Division of Aquatic Resources
Penalties
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Discharges Incidental to the Normal Operation of a Vessel
Division of Aquatic Resources
Penalties
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=468&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB468_.HTM |