HI SB460 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-07 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
Pending: House Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the hiring of one full-time equivalent librarian position for the Okinawan collection at the University of Hawaii at Manoa library. Effective 07/01/2050. (SD1)
Title
University of Hawaii Center for Okinawan Studies; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 137) in amended form (SD 1). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 709) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Reported from HRE/TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 404) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC will reconsider its previous decision on 02-12-13 and will hold a public decision making on 02-14-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-02-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Gabbard, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC deferred the measure until 02-12-13 1:20PM in conference room 414. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Kahele, Ige, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda, Slom. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to HRE/TEC, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1025 (Same As) 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).