HI SB450 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides ranked choice method of voting for all partisan primary elections, special elections, and nonpartisan general elections held in this State on or after 1/1/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Elections.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24SenateReferred to JDC, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB210 (Same As) 2019-02-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Matsumoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) Holt, McDermott, Nakamura, Ward excused (4).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback