HI SB428 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB428
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each county to develop a comprehensive integrated wastewater management plan and financial strategy. Requires each county to submit its respective plan and financial strategy to the Legislature. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Cesspools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1). |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-16 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Perruso. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-16-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB428 (Carry Over) 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.