HI SB428 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB428

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires each county to develop a comprehensive integrated wastewater management plan and financial strategy. Requires each county to submit its respective plan and financial strategy to the Legislature. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Cesspools.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2023-03-17HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-17HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran excused (1).
2023-03-17HouseReported from EEP/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1325) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2023-03-16HouseThe committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none.
2023-03-16HouseThe committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Perruso.
2023-03-10HouseBill scheduled to be heard by EEP/WAL on Thursday, 03-16-23 9:00AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE.
2023-03-09HouseReferred to EEP/WAL, CPC, FIN , referral sheet 17
2023-03-09HousePass First Reading
2023-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 166) in amended form (SD 1).
2023-03-07SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fukunaga). Transmitted to House.
2023-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23.
2023-03-02SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 669) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2023-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Aquino, DeCoite, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2023-02-16SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-23 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference.
2023-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
2023-02-08SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 88) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM.
2023-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa.
2023-01-27SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-23 1:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference.
2023-01-27SenateRe-Referred to AEN, WAM.
2023-01-25SenateReferred to AEN/PSM, WAM.
2023-01-20SenatePassed First Reading.
2023-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

SB428 (Carry Over) 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback