HI SB426 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB426
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medicaid and insurance coverage of ambulance services. Authorizes medicaid programs, and requires private insurers, to pay for ambulance services, even if the patient is not transported, if the patient was treated in a county with a population of 200,000 or more. Appropriates moneys for medicaid to cover ambulance services when a patient is not transported. Appropriates funds for ambulance services covered by medicaid.
Title
Relating To Health.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1258 (Same As) 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
SB426 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
SB426 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Re-Referred to CPH/HMS, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=426&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB426_.HTM |