HI SB422 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB422
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the content to be included in an election proclamation that is required to be filed not later than 4:30 p.m. on the tenth day prior to the close of filing. Specifies that the county clerk, not the chief election officer, shall issue a proclamation on voter service centers and places of deposit.
Title
Relating To Election Proclamations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDC . |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB422 (Carry Over) 2021-01-25 - Referred to JDC .
HB199 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Act 007, 04/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
HB199 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Act 007, 04/16/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1107).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=422&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB422_.HTM |