HI SB414 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Hawaii Educational Expenditure Trust Fund as a separate fund of the Department of Education for improving the education of, and supporting the programs benefiting, the students of the Hawaii public school system.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-30 | Senate | The committee on EDU deferred the measure. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 01-30-23 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB414 (Carry Over) 2023-01-30 - The committee on EDU deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=414&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB414_.HTM |