HI SB412 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB412
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an application for voter registration, including an affidavit, part of all driver's license and identification card applications. Automatically registers each applicant who elects to register for voting unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Requires sharing of information among the counties, DOT, and election personnel. (SB412 HD1)
Title
Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] | Sen. Laura Thielen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 10:15AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 225. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 826). |
2019-04-22 | House | House Conferees Appointed: C. Lee, Cullen Co-Chairs; Thielen. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Inouye Chair; K. Rhoads, K. Kahele Co-Chairs; Kim, Fevella. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 893). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 736). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Ward voting no (2) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2181), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5). |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1518) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-18 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Say; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 03-18-19 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-11 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-18-19. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 03-11-19 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 130) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1144) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, Harimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai, Gabbard, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-19 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 411) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Harimoto, English, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB412 (Carry Over) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
HB1203 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
HB1203 (Same As) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
Subjects
Affirmative Opt-out
Automatic Voter Registration
Driver's License
Identification Card
Instruction Permit
Provisional License
Automatic Voter Registration
Driver's License
Identification Card
Instruction Permit
Provisional License