HI HB1203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1203
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that any person who is eligible to vote and applies for a new or renewal motor vehicle driver's license, provisional license, or instruction permit, or a new, renewal, or duplicate identification card be automatically registered to vote if that person is not already registered to vote unless the applicant affirmatively declines to be registered to vote. Authorizes access to and electronic transmission of databases maintained or operated by the counties or the department of transportation containing driver's license or identification card information to election officials and the statewide voter registration system. Effective 1/1/2020.
Title
Relating To Voting.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-28 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2019-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1203 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6
SB412 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
SB412 (Same As) 2019-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-19 1:45PM in conference room 225.
Subjects
Affirmative Opt-out
Automatic Voter Registration
Driver's License
Identification Card
Instruction Permit
Provisional License
Automatic Voter Registration
Driver's License
Identification Card
Instruction Permit
Provisional License
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1203&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB1203_.HTM |