HI SB411 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB411
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Water and Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends fines for the destroying or harvesting of koa trees and other trees and plants on state lands to an amount up to the current market value of each tree or plant at that location and the cost of restoration or replacement of the habitat. Clarifies that any person that violates a provision of part II of chapter 183, HRS (forest reserves), or any rule adopted pursuant thereto, other than section 183-17, HRS, shall be guilty of a petty misdemeanor. Repeals the general penalty provision of chapter 183, HRS.
Title
Relating To Chapter 183, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL/JDC, WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-17 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1343 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB411 (Carry Over) 2017-02-06 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
SB411 (Carry Over) 2017-02-06 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Subjects
Destruction or Harvesting of Trees and Plants on State Lands
Forest Reserve Violations
Koa Trees
Penalties
Timber Trespass in Forest Reserves
Forest Reserve Violations
Koa Trees
Penalties
Timber Trespass in Forest Reserves
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=411&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB411_.HTM |