HI SB406 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB406
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a collective bargaining unit for full-time graduate student assistants employed by the University of Hawaii. Delays formation of the graduate student assistant collective bargaining unit until 7/1/2018. Effective 01/07/2059. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Collective Bargaining.
Sponsors
Sen. Kaiali'i Kahele [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
Sen. William Espero [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Reported from JDL/HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 100) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL/HRE, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1277 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB406 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
SB406 (Carry Over) 2017-02-09 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.