HI SB394 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-12 - Act 096, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the rules for sourcing the sales factor for net income tax to impose market sourcing for sales of other than tangible personal property. Provides specific rules for intangibles and services. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-12SenateAct 096, 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
2019-06-12HouseAct 096, on 06/07/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1197).
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Say, Ward voting no (5) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 26) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 26).
2019-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 823).
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 10:30AM in conference room 309.
2019-04-18HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Luke Chair; Cullen, McDermott.
2019-04-16HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 903).
2019-04-16SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Dela Cruz Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; Fevella.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-05SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 576).
2019-04-04HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Kong, Okimoto, Say, Ward voting no (6) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseDeferred one day 04-04-19.
2019-04-01HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ward voting no (1) and Representative(s) Hashem, McKelvey, Saiki, Todd excused (4).
2019-04-01HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1907) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-03-15HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 03-15-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 124) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 749) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-06SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 10:00AM in conference room 211.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback