HI SB353 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB353
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of GO bonds for plans of a biological control containment facility on Oahu.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 39) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB353 (Carry Over) 2017-02-03 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Biological Control Facility
Capital Improvement Project
Department of Agriculture
General Obligation Bonds
Biological Control Facility
Capital Improvement Project
Department of Agriculture
General Obligation Bonds
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=353&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB353_.HTM |