HI SB350 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB350
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the clean water branch to perform water quality testing during brown water advisories as practicable and inform the public of health risks associated with water runoff during brown water advisories. Requires the department of health to consider environmental justice issues when making certain assessments and determinations. Appropriates funds for positions within the department of health. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Environment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-21 5:16 PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-21 12:00 PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-21 10:15AM; CR 325. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-21 5:00PM; CR 325. |
2021-04-21 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-22-21 9:30AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-21-21 9:30AM in conference room CR 325. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Lowen, Johanson, Marten Co-Chairs; Matsumoto. |
2021-04-16 | House | Re-referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 792). |
2021-04-15 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 790). |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; English Co-Chair; Rhoads. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 512). |
2021-04-13 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Ohno excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-13-21. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1850) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-23 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1224) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-16 | House | Re-referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 26 |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-16-21 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 202) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 876) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 461) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HTH/AEN, WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB350 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-21 5:16 PM; CR 325.
Subjects
Appropriation
Beaches
Brown Water Advisories
Clean Water Branch
DOH
Environmental Justice
Environmental Management Division
Hawaii Beach Monitoring Program
Beaches
Brown Water Advisories
Clean Water Branch
DOH
Environmental Justice
Environmental Management Division
Hawaii Beach Monitoring Program