HI SB346 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB346
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 929).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-29 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 929).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Effective 1/1/2028, makes it unlawful for farm owners or operators and business owners or operators to sell or offer for sale any shell egg in the State that is not USDA certified cage free, as evidenced by a USDA certified cage free grademark or shield. Exempts certain commercial table-egg layer premises. Establishes the cage free matching grant program until 6/30/2027. Establishes penalties. Requires DOA to establish rules. Appropriates funds. Repeals on 6/30/2032. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Farm Animals.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-29 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 929). |
2022-04-29 | Senate | Senate Conferees Discharged: Senator Gabbard discharged as Chair. Senator Rhoads discharged as Co-Chair. Senators Fevella, Acasio discharged as Conferees. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-22 8:35AM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-22 8:40AM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-22 6:10PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-26-22 5:30PM; Conference Room 325. |
2022-04-22 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 894). |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Gabbard Chair; Rhoads Co-Chair; Acasio, Fevella. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 740). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Nishimoto added as Co-Chair. Representative Perruso discharged as Co-Chair. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 729). |
2022-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Hashem, Perruso Co-Chairs; Branco, Matsumoto. |
2022-04-08 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 742). |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 453). |
2022-04-07 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Lowen excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1807-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2022-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 04-01-22 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 32 |
2022-03-18 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 31 |
2022-03-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Matayoshi voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Branco, Ilagan, McKelvey, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-18 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1137-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-03-16 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd, Matsumoto; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-16-22 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-12 | House | Re-referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23 |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 201) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 843) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-02-21 9:35AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Re-Referred to AEN, JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN/JDC. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 65) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN/JDC. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-21 1:00PM in conference room Videoconference. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Referred to AEN, CPN/JDC. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB538 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB346 (Carry Over) 2021-03-12 - Re-referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
SB346 (Carry Over) 2021-03-12 - Re-referred to AGR, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 23
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Cage Free Matching Grant Program
Certified Cage Free
Sale of Shell Eggs
USDA Grademark
USDA Shield
Cage Free Matching Grant Program
Certified Cage Free
Sale of Shell Eggs
USDA Grademark
USDA Shield