HI SB339 | 2022 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB339

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies that a taxpayer may claim the important agricultural land qualified agricultural cost tax credit no earlier than the third taxable year after application for first-year certification of the credit. Extends the time that the department of agriculture may certify the important agricultural land qualified agricultural costs tax credit from 12/31/2021 to 12/31/2030. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2021. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Important Agricultural Land Qualified Agricultural Cost Tax Credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-12-10 Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
2021-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
2021-03-16HouseBill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Friday, 03-19-21 10:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference.
2021-02-23HouseReferred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 17
2021-02-23HousePass First Reading
2021-02-22HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 34) in amended form (SD 2).
2021-02-22SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2021-02-19Senate48 Hrs. Notice 02-22-21.
2021-02-19SenateReported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 582) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2).
2021-02-17SenateThe committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai.
2021-02-10SenateThe committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-17-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference.
2021-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-10-21 10:10AM in conference room 211.
2021-02-04SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2021-02-04SenateReported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 4) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2021-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Nishihara, Acasio, Rhoads, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2021-01-28SenateThe committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference.
2021-01-25SenateReferred to AEN, WAM.
2021-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB830 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB339 (Carry Over) 2021-03-19 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback