HI SB3370 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - The committee on TRS deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a three-year pilot program within the Department of Transportation that requires procurement of professional services from construction management consultants using the competitive sealed bidding and competitive sealed proposals methods of procurement. Exempts emergency procurements. Requires annual reports to the Legislature.
Title
Relating To Construction Management.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | The committee on TRS deferred the measure. |
2022-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS deferred the measure until 02-15-22 3:35PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-22 3:00PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2354 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to GVR/TRN, CPC, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Competitive Sealed Bidding
Competitive Sealed Proposals
Construction Management
Consultants
Department of Transportation
Pilot Program
Procurement
Professional Services Contracts
Competitive Sealed Proposals
Construction Management
Consultants
Department of Transportation
Pilot Program
Procurement
Professional Services Contracts
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3370&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB3370_.HTM |