HI SB335 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of arbitration to resolve certain family law and child-related disputes. Specifies law and procedures applicable to family law and child-related arbitrations. (SB335 HD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Uniform Family Law Arbitration Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-17 10:20AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-20SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-17 10:50AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K. Rhoads, L. Thielen.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott.
2017-04-06HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514).
2017-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2017-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-17.
2017-04-03SenateDeferred One Day 04-04-17.
2017-03-31SenateDeferred One Day 04-03-17.
2017-03-30SenateDeferred One Day 03-31-17.
2017-03-29SenateDeferred One Day 03-30-17.
2017-03-29SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 377).
2017-03-28HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, McDermott, McKelvey excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-24HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Souki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (8).
2017-03-24HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1391) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-03-15HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Johanson, Nakashima, Oshiro, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, C. Lee, Morikawa.
2017-03-13HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 03-15-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-03-09HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 27
2017-03-09HousePass First Reading
2017-03-07HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 127) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-03-07SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-03-02Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17.
2017-03-02SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-03-02SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 552) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-01-26SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-01-23SenateReferred to JDL.
2017-01-23SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-01-20SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB1235 (Same As) 2017-07-11 - Act 113, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1214).

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback