HI HB1235 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 11 2017 - 75% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Transmitted to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the use of arbitration to resolve certain family law disputes and child-related disputes. Specifies law and procedures applicable to arbitrations. (HB1235 CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Uniform Family Law Arbitration Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03HouseTransmitted to Governor.
2017-05-04SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642).
2017-05-03HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737).
2017-05-02HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2017-05-02SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17.
2017-04-27SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 80).
2017-04-27HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17.
2017-04-27HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 80) as amended in (CD 1).
2017-04-27SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2017-04-27HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-27-17 at 4:00PM in Conference Room 325.
2017-04-26HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-27-17 10:30AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-25HouseConference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-26-17 2:00PM in conference room 325.
2017-04-24HouseBill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-25-17 10:00AM in conference room 325.
2017-04-18HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 680).
2017-04-18SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; K. Rhoads, L. Thielen.
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 586).
2017-04-17SenateReceived notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 585).
2017-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto Chair; San Buenaventura, McDermott.
2017-04-13HouseHouse disagrees with Senate amendment (s).
2017-04-11HouseReturned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 640) in amended form (SD 1).
2017-04-11SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2017-04-06Senate48 Hrs. Notice 04-11-17.
2017-04-06SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2017-04-06SenateReported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1459) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-03-17SenateThe committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2017-03-13SenateThe committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-17 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to JDL.
2017-03-09SenatePassed First Reading.
2017-03-09SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 328).
2017-03-07HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2017-03-02HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ichiyama excused (1).
2017-03-02HouseReported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2017-02-03HouseThe committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Oshiro, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott.
2017-02-01HouseBill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 02-03-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325.
2017-01-30HouseReferred to JUD, referral sheet 6
2017-01-25HousePass First Reading
2017-01-24HousePending introduction.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback