HI SB3305 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Act 154, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on July 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Act 154, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires all public charter schools that exclusively offer prekindergarten programs to adhere to the public charter school law, with certain exceptions. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - House - House Conference: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Act 154, 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255). |
2024-07-02 | House | Act 154, on 07/01/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1255). |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 830). |
2024-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 798). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ganaden, Martinez, Nakashima excused (3). |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Wednesday, 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 161-24) as amended in (CD 1). |
2024-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-24. |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 161-24). |
2024-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Morikawa, Martinez, M. Mizuno, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kanuha, Hashimoto; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-24 1:30PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-24 2:09PM; Conference Room 229. |
2024-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 690). |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Kanuha Co-Chair; Hashimoto. |
2024-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 737). |
2024-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Tarnas, Morikawa Co-Chairs; Martinez, M. Mizuno, Takayama, Garcia. |
2024-04-04 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 366). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 548). |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1610-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Alcos. |
2024-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-21 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima excused (2). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1250-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Miyake, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2024-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-19-24 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Amato voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Alcos, Martinez, Quinlan excused (3). |
2024-03-14 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1100-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-03-12 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, La Chica, Kapela, Marten, Martinez, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Perruso, Quinlan, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Garcia. |
2024-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-12-24 2:30PM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to EDN, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 45). |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-01-24. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2826) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite, Inouye. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-24 10:30AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2333) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Hashimoto, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Richards. |
2024-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-24 3:05PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, WAM. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |