HI SB328 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB328
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/CPH, JDC.
Pending: Senate Labor, Culture and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits noncompete agreements for low wage workers whose earnings do not exceed the greater of the hourly rate equal to the minimum wage required by applicable federal or state law or $15 per hour.
Title
Relating To Fair Employment Practices.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to LCA/CPH, JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB328 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to LCA/CPH, JDC.
HB1059 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Re-Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM.
HB1186 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
HB1059 (Same As) 2019-03-07 - Re-Referred to LCA/JDC, WAM.
HB1186 (Same As) 2019-03-21 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=328&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SB328_.HTM |