HI SB3268 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to LAT/HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to LAT/HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the University of Hawaii Board of Regents to terminate the Athletic Director and head coaches for cause. Requires Board of Regents approval of all coaching contracts with salaries greater than $200,000, including additional private funding and bonuses. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Athletics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to LAT/HET, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 495) in amended form (SD 1). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2899) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2402) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kim, Kidani, Keith-Agaran, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Wakai ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-22 3:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HRE, JDC/WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |