HI SB320 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB320
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DNA samples from a felony offender regardless of whether the offender completed a criminal sentence, or was otherwise discharged from the jurisdiction of the court, for the qualifying felony offense prior to July 1, 2017, and retroactively to July 1, 2005. Takes effect on 1/7/2059. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Forensic Identification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 124) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 626) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Inouye, Wakai. |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-17 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 355) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDL, WAM. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 01-31-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB320 (Carry Over) 2017-03-09 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27
HB703 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3
HB703 (Same As) 2017-01-25 - Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3