HI SB3192 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Labor & Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes within the Department of Land and Natural Resources a visitor impact fee program to collect a fee to allow visitors to visit a state park, beach, state-owned forest, hiking trail, or other state-owned natural area. Establishes the Environmental Legacy Commission to allocate the revenues from the visitor impact fee to protect and manage Hawaii's natural resources. Establishes the visitor impact fee special fund. Appropriates funds. Takes effect 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Natural Resource Management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-11 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on LAT with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-03-17 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1048-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to LAT. |
2022-03-15 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Marten, Hashem, Perruso, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi. |
2022-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to EEP, LAT, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 471) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3103) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-22 10:05AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2386) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Misalucha, Lee, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-11-22 3:10PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to WTL/EET, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2245 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to EEP/LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3