HI SB3185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends chapter 103D, HRS, to add to part III a new section allowing an alternative procurement method when the federal government provides for or approves the alternative procurement method, and the head of the purchasing agency makes a written determination that it is neither practicable nor advantageous to use the existing statutory procurement methods. Amends sections 103D-102(b)(4) and 103D-102(b)(4)(L), HRS, to exempt certain construction procurement from the Hawaii Public Procurement Code when it is neither practicable nor advantageous to the State. Amends section 103D-301, HRS, methods of source selection, to add the alternative procurement method. Amends section 103D-405, HRS, to allow the Chief Procurement Officer to provide a waiver for certain outside contractors that participated in the development of a solicitation package that would otherwise be precluded from bidding on or receiving a contract. Takes effect 7/1/2112. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2704) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-15-24 4:00PM; Conference Room 225. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-24 4:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2496 (Same As) 2024-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:05AM in conference room 016.