HI HB2496 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:05AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-24 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:05AM in conference room 016.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Adds alternative procurement methods to the types of methods of source selection. Allows an alternative procurement method when the federal government provides for or approves the alternative procurement method and the head of the purchasing agency makes a written determination that it is neither practicable nor advantageous to use the existing statutory procurement methods. Exempts from the Hawaii Public Procurement Code contracts by government bodies to procure certain construction projects. Takes effect 7/1/2491. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Procurement.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - Senate - Senate Government Operations: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-25-24 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-24-24 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-22 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-23-24 9:05AM in conference room 016. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 780). |
2024-04-18 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Matayoshi, Garrett Co-Chairs; Kapela, Alcos. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: McKelvey Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 637) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3776) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) DeCoite. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-24 10:15AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3267) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) McKelvey, Gabbard, San Buenaventura, Wakai, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 03-19-24 3:00PM; CR 225. |
2024-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-14-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to GVO, WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 149). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 820-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran, Ward. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima excused (1). |
2024-02-09 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 227-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-06 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Sayama, Tam, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3185 (Same As) 2024-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.