HI SB3144 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3).
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the office of solid waste management to establish a recycled products manufacturing grant program to support recycled products manufacturers or bioconversion or compositing businesses in the State. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Grants For Local Recycling Facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on EDB with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, McDermott, Thielen excused (3). |
2020-03-13 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1057-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to EDB. |
2020-03-12 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Yamane, Thielen. |
2020-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 03-12-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to EEP, EDB, FIN, referral sheet 36 |
2020-03-05 | House | Pass First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 507) in amended form (SD 2). |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3351) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2020-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-27-20 10:35AM in conference room 211. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2627) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2020-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Fevella. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-10-20 2:20PM in conference room 224. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to AEN, WAM. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2404 (Same As) 2020-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).