HI SB3126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Emergency Aeromedical Services Partnership Program to be administered by the Department of Health in counties with a population less than 500,000. Requires cost-sharing for program operations and maintenance and revenue sharing between the State and Counties of Hawaii, Kauai, and Maui. Authorizes deposits into the Emergency Medical Services Special Fund. Requires rulemaking. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Emergency Aeromedical Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-01 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694). |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: San Buenaventura Chair; Wakai, DeCoite Co-Chairs. |
2024-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 670). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 687). |
2024-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Pierick voting no (1) and Representative(s) Souza excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1790-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi. |
2024-03-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-02-24 4:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-21 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Martinez, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-03-21 | House | Reported from HLT/TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1240-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-03-19 | House | The committee on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Takenouchi, Amato, Ilagan, Kobayashi, Marten, Garcia; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nishimoto. |
2024-03-14 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by HLT/TRN on Tuesday, 03-19-24 11:00AM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT/TRN on Tuesday, 03-19-24 11:00AM in House conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 275) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-24. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3030) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-24 9:55AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Reported from HHS/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2221) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HHS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Aquino, Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Awa. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on HHS/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HHS/PSM, WAM. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2437 (Same As) 2024-01-26 - Referred to HLT/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Subjects
Appropriation
DOH
Emergency Aeromedical Services Partnership Program
Established
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Rules
DOH
Emergency Aeromedical Services Partnership Program
Established
Expenditure Ceiling ($)
Rules