HI HB2437 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to HLT/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-26 - Referred to HLT/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an Emergency Aeromedical Services Partnership Program to be administered by the Department of Health in counties with a population less than 500,000. Requires cost-sharing for program operations and maintenance and revenue sharing between the State and the County of Hawaii, the County of Kauai, and the County of Maui. Authorizes deposits into the Emergency Medical Services Special Fund. Requires rulemaking.
Title
Relating To Emergency Aeromedical Services.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to HLT/TRN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3126 (Same As) 2024-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 694).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2437&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2437_.HTM |