HI SB3121 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-25 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist PQ Energy LLC and to be formed special purpose entities with the development and construction of renewable energy plants within the State of Hawaii. (SD1)
Title
Waste-to-energy Power; Renewable Energy; Sustainable Energy; Waste Management; Clean Energy; PQ Energy LLC; Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-25 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2016-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-16 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Reported from TRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2463) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRE were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chun Oakland, English, Kidani, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-17-16 2:45PM in conference room 225. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRE, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2607 (Same As) 2016-03-22 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.