HI SB3116 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on WLA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-10 - The committee on WLA deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Water, Land, and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a Dam and Reservoir Working Group to ensure and enhance the continued availability and operation of dams and reservoirs in the State of Hawaii.
Title
Dam and Reservoir Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-10 | Senate | The committee on WLA deferred the measure. |
2016-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA deferred the measure until 02-10-16 2:46PM in conference room 224. |
2016-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WLA has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-16 10:00AM in conference room 224. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Referred to WLA, WAM. |
2016-01-29 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2054 (Same As) 2016-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Thielen, Tokioka excused (3).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=3116&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB3116_.HTM |