HI SB3110 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Referred to WLH/HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits nonresident aliens and businesses and trusts that are significantly controlled by nonresident aliens from acquiring certain residential property in the State, except as otherwise provided by law. Effective 12/31/50. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09HouseReferred to WLH/HSG, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 36
2020-03-05HousePass First Reading
2020-03-03HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 494) in amended form (SD 1).
2020-03-03SenateReport Adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House.
2020-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-03-20.
2020-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3138) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2020-02-25SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, J.Keohokalole, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard.
2020-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-25-20 12:15PM in conference room 016.
2020-02-14SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
2020-02-14SenateReported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2830) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC.
2020-02-12SenateThe committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Nishihara ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2020-02-07SenateThe committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-12-20 1:15PM in conference room 229.
2020-01-29SenateRe-Referred to WTL, JDC.
2020-01-27SenateReferred to WTL/LCA, JDC.
2020-01-27SenatePassed First Reading.
2020-01-23SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback