HI SB311 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Human Services to establish and administer a two-year Infant and Toddler Child Care Contracted Slots Pilot Program. Requires annual reports on the pilot program's development and administration to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Repeals 6/30/2027.
Title
Relating To Child Care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to HHS, WAM. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB311 (Carry Over) 2023-01-25 - Referred to HHS, WAM.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Child Care
Child Care Connection Hawaii
Contracted Slots
Department of Human Services
Infants
Pilot Program
Subsidies
Toddlers
Child Care
Child Care Connection Hawaii
Contracted Slots
Department of Human Services
Infants
Pilot Program
Subsidies
Toddlers
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=311&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/SB311_.HTM |