HI SB3106 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides three categories and twelve factors for the department of labor and industrial relations to apply to determine independent contractor status. Takes effect 1/1/2045. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Independent Contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2300) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-18 3:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to LBR, JDC. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2602 (Same As) 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 691).