HI HB2602 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 691).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 691).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides three categories and twelve factors for the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to apply to determine independent contractor status. Takes effect on 1/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Independent Contractors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 691). |
2018-04-27 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2018-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 793). |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Tokuda Chair; English Co-Chair; Ihara. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 616). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Changed: Representative Cullen added as Co-Chair. Representative Yamashita discharged as Co-Chair. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, Yamashita Co-Chairs; Keohokalole, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 751) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 3 (Senator(s) S. Chang, K. Rhoads, Taniguchi). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Reported from LBR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3427) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) S. Chang, Taniguchi; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR has scheduled a public hearing on 03-20-18 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LBR. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 239). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 987-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Cachola, Nakamura; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, McDermott, Nakamura, Souki, Todd excused (6). |
2018-02-15 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 471-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Evans; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 9 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3106 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.