HI SB3101 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts any homestead development for the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands from the general excise tax and use tax. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Tax Exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-18 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - Senate - Senate Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 24 |
2022-03-10 | House | Pass First Reading |
2022-03-08 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-22. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3142) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Misalucha, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-18-22 10:00AM; Conference Room 211 & Videoconference. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2118) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2022-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Keohokalole, Acasio; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-22 1:01PM; Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HWN, WAM. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB2133 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3